IN SCR0013 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 41-11)
Status: Passed on February 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-15 - Returned to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 41-11)
Status: Passed on February 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-15 - Returned to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the Indiana Department of Transportation to rename a section of Interstate 69 at Exit 120 in Monroe County "The Reserve Deputy Sheriff James Driver Memorial Bridge".
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the Indiana Department of Transportation to rename a section of Interstate 69 at Exit 120 in Monroe County "The Reserve Deputy Sheriff James Driver Memorial Bridge".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-14 - House - House - Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Returned to the Senate |
2022-02-14 | House | Representatives Saunders and Ellington added as cosponsors |
2022-02-14 | House | Representative Pierce added as sponsor |
2022-02-14 | House | Representative Pierce removed as cosponsor |
2022-02-14 | House | Representative Saunders removed as sponsor |
2022-02-14 | House | Second reading: adopted Roll Call 172: yeas 90, nays 0 |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-01-26 | House | First reading: referred to the Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Senators Alting, Baldwin, Bassler, Becker, Boehnlein, Bohacek, Boots, Bray, Breaux, Brown L, Buchanan, Buck, Busch, Charbonneau, Crane, Crider, Donato, Doriot, Ford J.D., Ford Jon, Freeman, Garten, Gaskill, Glick, Holdman, Houchin, Koch, Kruse, Lanane, Leising, Melton, Messmer, Mishler, Niemeyer, Niezgodski, Perfect, Pol, Qaddoura, Raatz, Randolph, Rogers, Sandlin, Taylor G, Tomes, Walker G, Walker K, Young M, Zay added as coauthors |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Pierce |
2022-01-20 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Saunders |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Second reading: adopted voice vote |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-01-13 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Authored by Senator Yoder |