IN SCR0013 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-16 - Returned to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION congratulating Julie Evans on receiving the 2020 Indiana Rural Teacher of the Year Award.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION congratulating Julie Evans on receiving the 2020 Indiana Rural Teacher of the Year Award.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-16HouseReturned to the Senate
2021-03-15HouseFirst reading: adopted voice vote
2021-03-09SenateReferred to the House
2021-03-08SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Ellington
2021-03-08SenateFirst reading: adopted voice vote
2021-03-08SenateAuthored by Senator Bassler

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback