IN SCR0010 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on February 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-10 - Returned to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on February 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-10 - Returned to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Commemorating the 60th anniversary of Gideon v. Wainwright. A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION commemorating the 60th anniversary of the United States Supreme Court's decision in Gideon v. Wainwright.
Title
Commemorating the 60th anniversary of Gideon v. Wainwright.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-10 | House | Returned to the Senate |
2023-02-09 | House | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2023-01-31 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Pierce M |
2023-01-31 | Senate | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Coauthored by Senators Taylor G, Yoder, Ford J.D., Qaddoura, Melton, Niezgodski, Hunley, Randolph Lonnie M, Breaux |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Authored by Senators Pol and Freeman |
Subjects
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2023/resolutions/senate/concurrent/10 |
Text | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2023/resolutions/senate/concurrent/10#1.INTR |