IN SCR0007 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 41-14)
Status: Passed on February 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - Returned to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 41-14)
Status: Passed on February 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - Returned to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Urging INDOT to rename the bridge over I-70 and North College Avenue the "John Leslie 'Wes' Montgomery Memorial Bridge". A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the Indiana Department of Transportation to rename that portion of the I-65N bridge over I-70 and North College Avenue the "John Leslie 'Wes' Montgomery Memorial Bridge".
Title
Urging INDOT to rename the bridge over I-70 and North College Avenue the "John Leslie 'Wes' Montgomery Memorial Bridge".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-15 - House - House - Second reading (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-16 | House | Returned to the Senate |
2024-02-15 | House | Second reading: adopted Roll Call 149: yeas 81, nays 0 |
2024-02-15 | House | Representatives Summers, Hamilton, Torr added as cosponsors |
2024-02-13 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2024-01-31 | House | First reading: referred to the Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Senators Alexander, Alting, Baldwin, Bassler, Becker, Bohacek, Bray, Breaux, Brown L, Buchanan, Buck, Busch, Byrne, Carrasco, Charbonneau, Crane, Crider, Deery, Dernulc, Donato, Doriot, Ford J.D., Freeman, Garten, Gaskill, Glick, Goode, Holdman, Johnson T, Koch, Leising, Maxwell, Messmer, Mishler, Niemeyer, Niezgodski, Pol, Qaddoura, Raatz, Randolph, Rogers, Tomes, Vinzant, Walker G, Walker K, Yoder, Young M, Zay added as coauthors |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Harris |
2024-01-25 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Porter |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Second reading: adopted voice vote |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2024-01-18 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Authored by Senators Taylor G and Hunley |