IN SCR0006 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Representative Zent added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the Indiana Department of Transportation to place a memorial sign where the 38th parallel crosses State Road 69, south of Copperline Road in Posey County, Indiana, entitled "Posey County honoring the Veterans of the Korean War, here lies the 38th Parallel".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the Indiana Department of Transportation to place a memorial sign where the 38th parallel crosses State Road 69, south of Copperline Road in Posey County, Indiana, entitled "Posey County honoring the Veterans of the Korean War, here lies the 38th Parallel".

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-08 - House - House - Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-11HouseRepresentative Zent added as cosponsor
2021-03-08HouseReturned to the Senate
2021-03-08HouseSecond reading: adopted Roll Call 247: yeas 91, nays 0
2021-03-04HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-02-22HouseFirst reading: referred to the Committee on Roads and Transportation
2021-02-12SenateReferred to the House
2021-02-11SenateHouse sponsor: Representative McNamara
2021-02-11SenateSecond reading: adopted voice vote
2021-02-09SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-02-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
2021-02-04SenateCoauthored by Senator Becker
2021-02-04SenateAuthored by Senators Tomes, Garten, Boots

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/resolutions/senate/concurrent/6
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/e/9/2/1e92fe27/SC0006.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/1/c/3/41c3faa0/SC0006.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/b/e/d/ebed8b46/SC0006.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/c/c/1/7cc118bd/SC0006.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/b/1/b/3b1b5d90/SC0006.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/d/3/2/cd32858c/SC0006.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/b/2/b/3b2bf472/SC0006.03.COMS.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/f/d/9/ffd931e0/SC0006.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/4/1/4/3414c3ae/SC0006.03.COMS.CRH001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/c/4/6/cc467b9f/SC0006.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/8/2/a/082a4ecc/SC0006.03.COMS.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/7/a/f/87af3523/SC0006.247_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback