IN SCR0002 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 41-10)
Status: Passed on January 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-23 - Returned to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 41-10)
Status: Passed on January 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-23 - Returned to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing the USS Indianapolis (LCS 17) and its crew. A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION recognizing the ongoing military efforts of the USS Indianapolis (LCS 17) and its crew.
Title
Recognizing the USS Indianapolis (LCS 17) and its crew.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-23 | House | Returned to the Senate |
2024-01-22 | House | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Senators Alexander, Alting, Bassler, Becker, Bohacek, Breaux, Brown L, Buchanan, Buck, Busch, Byrne, Carrasco, Charbonneau, Crane, Crider, Deery, Dernulc, Donato, Doriot, Ford J.D., Freeman, Gaskill, Glick, Goode G, Holdman, Hunley, Johnson, T, Koch, Leising, Maxwell, Messmer, Mishler, Niemeyer, Niezgodski, Pol, Qaddoura, Raatz, Randolph, Rogers, Taylor G, Tomes, Vinzant, Walker G, Walker K, Yoder, Young M, Zay added as coauthors |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Senator Baldwin added as coauthor |
2024-01-09 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Huston |
2024-01-09 | Senate | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Authored by Senators Bray and Garten |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2024/resolutions/senate/concurrent/2/details |
Text | https://iga.in.gov/pdf-documents/123/2024/senate/resolutions/SC0002/SC0002.01.INTR.pdf |