IN SB0623 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Representative Harris added as cosponsor
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Property tax matters. Provides that a county assessor or township assessor (if any) may request the department of local government finance (department) to perform a state conducted assessment of a particular commercial building or structure used for retail purposes. Specifies the procedures for the state conducted assessment. Provides that the true tax value of commercial real property used for retail purposes that is occupied by the original owner or by a tenant for which the improvement was built shall be determined by the cost approach for the first 10 years of occupancy of the property, less normal depreciation and normal obsolescence under the rules and guidelines of the department of local government finance. Provides that a county fiscal body may adopt an ordinance to provide that the county assessor be reimbursed for legal costs (in addition to other specified costs under current law) incurred by the county assessor in defending an appeal that is uncommon and infrequent in the normal course of defending appeals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property tax matters. Provides that a county assessor or township assessor (if any) may request the department of local government finance (department) to perform a state conducted assessment of a particular commercial building or structure used for retail purposes. Specifies the procedures for the state conducted assessment. Provides that the true tax value of commercial real property used for retail purposes that is occupied by the original owner or by a tenant for which the improvement was built shall be determined by the cost approach for the first 10 years of occupancy of the property, less normal depreciation and normal obsolescence under the rules and guidelines of the department of local government finance. Provides that a county fiscal body may adopt an ordinance to provide that the county assessor be reimbursed for legal costs (in addition to other specified costs under current law) incurred by the county assessor in defending an appeal that is uncommon and infrequent in the normal course of defending appeals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-26 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19HouseRepresentative Harris added as cosponsor
2019-03-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-02-27SenateReferred to the House
2019-02-26SenateCosponsor: Representative Manning
2019-02-26SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Schaibley
2019-02-26SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 254: yeas 42, nays 7
2019-02-25SenateAmendment #2 (Buchanan) prevailed; voice vote
2019-02-25SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-02-21SenateSenators Messmer, Buck, Charbonneau, Stoops added as coauthors
2019-02-21SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-02-19SenateSenator Ford J.D. added as coauthor
2019-01-15SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
2019-01-15SenateCoauthored by Senators Becker and Walker
2019-01-15SenateAuthored by Senators Buchanan and Boots

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback