IN SB0615 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 200
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Real estate licensing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Real estate licensing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-22 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-13HousePublic Law 200
2013-05-07SenateSigned by the Governor
2013-04-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2013-04-25HouseSigned by the Speaker
2013-04-24SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2013-04-22SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 501: yeas 48, nays 0
2013-04-18SenateMotion to concur in House amendments filed
2013-03-26HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2013-03-26HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 359: yeas 93, nays 0
2013-03-25HouseRepresentatives Moseley, Morris and Klinker added as cosponsors
2013-03-21HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-03-19HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-02-26HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
2013-02-19SenateHouse sponsor: Rep. Davis
2013-02-19SenateReferred to the House
2013-02-19SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 145: yeas 49 and nays 0
2013-02-14SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-02-11SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-01-24SenateSenator Broden added as coauthor
2013-01-24SenateSenator Alting added as second author
2013-01-17SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Economic Development & Technology
2013-01-17SenateAuthored by Senator Merritt

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback