IN SB0578 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for enactment of a surplus lines insurance compact. Specifies requirements applying to compacting states and contracting states with respect to provision of surplus lines insurance in multiple states. Provides for collection of premium taxes on surplus lines insurance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Surplus lines insurance compact.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 31 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-18 Effective 07/01/2011
2011-05-17 Public Law 111
2011-05-09 Signed by the Governor
2011-05-02 Signed by the President of the Senate
2011-04-27 Signed by the Speaker
2011-04-26 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2011-04-19 Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 386: yeas 39, nays 9
2011-04-14 Motion to concur in House amendments filed
2011-04-08 Returned to the Senate with amendments
2011-04-08 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 453: yeas 89, nays 0
2011-04-07 Amendment 1 (Lehman), prevailed; voice vote
2011-04-07 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2011-04-04 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2011-03-28 First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance
2011-02-22 Cosponsor: Rep. C. Fry
2011-02-22 House sponsor: Rep. Lehman
2011-02-22 Referred to the House
2011-02-22 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 251: yeas 41 and nays 8
2011-02-21 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2011-02-17 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2011-01-20 First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions
2011-01-20 Authored by Senators Simpson and Holdman

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback