IN SB0577 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - SECTIONS 3 through 23 effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Names certain private colleges that qualify as approved postsecondary educational institutions. Specifies that students with associate degrees shall be treated the same as other applicants for scholarship awards. Requires attainment of a minimum cumulative grade point average to retain certain scholarships. In addition, with respect to the twenty-first century scholars program, specifies that certain applicants must attend an academic success program and meet certain financial need criteria. Limits scholarships and tuition remission programs to courses for an undergraduate degree and requires the scholarships be used in not more than eight years. Permits a scholarship to be used for summer classes and provides special rules for professional degree students. Provides a formula for calculating certain scholarships and tuition remission programs. Indicates that changes affecting tuition remissions for children of certain veterans apply only to children of veterans who enlist after July 1, 2011. Establishes a program for the collection of data from private colleges. Provides civil immunity to persons who provide the student data. Merges the higher education award fund and the freedom of choice grant fund. Makes other related changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Financial aid.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-27 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - House - House - Third reading: recommitted to Committee of One, amendment adopted, passed (Y: 68 N: 25 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - House - House - Amendment 10 (M. Smith), prevailed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - House - House - Amendment 4 (Goodin), failed (Y: 33 N: 57 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 2 (Hume), failed (Y: 10 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-18 SECTIONS 3 through 23 effective 07/01/2011
2011-05-18 SECTION 2 effective 05/10/2011
2011-05-18 SECTION 1 effective 07/01/2011
2011-05-17 Public Law 169
2011-05-10 Signed by the Governor
2011-05-02 Signed by the President of the Senate
2011-04-29 Signed by the Speaker
2011-04-28 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2011-04-27 Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 481: yeas 41, nays 8
2011-04-25 Motion to concur in House amendments filed
2011-04-21 Returned to the Senate with amendments
2011-04-21 Amendment 11 ( Dermody) and prevailed; voice vote
2011-04-21 Third reading: recommitted to Committee of One, amendment adopted, passed; Roll Call 629: yeas 68, nays 25
2011-04-20 Amendment 10 (M. Smith), prevailed; Roll Call 605: yeas 93, nays 0
2011-04-20 Amendment 4 (Goodin), failed; Roll Call 604: yeas 33, nays 57
2011-04-20 Amendment 8 (Dermody), prevailed; voice vote
2011-04-20 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2011-04-05 Representatives Porter and Welch added as cosponsors
2011-04-05 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2011-03-28 First reading: referred to Committee on Education
2011-02-10 Senator Boots added as second author
2011-02-10 Cosponsor: Rep. Espich
2011-02-10 House sponsor: Rep. Dermody
2011-02-10 Referred to the House
2011-02-10 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 104: yeas 32 and nays 17
2011-02-07 Amendment 2 (Hume), failed; Roll Call 76: yeas 18, nays 31
2011-02-07 Amendment 1 (Kenley), prevailed;
2011-02-07 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2011-02-03 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2011-01-20 First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
2011-01-20 Authored by Senator Kenley

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.in.gov/apps/lsa/session/billwatch/billinfo?year=2011&session=1&request=getBill&doctype=SB&docno=0577
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/IN/IN0577.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/SB/SB0577.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/SB/SB0577.2.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/ES/ES0577.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/ES/ES0577.2.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/ES/ES0577.3.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/SE/SE0577.1.html
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/PDF/Srollcal/0076.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/PDF/Srollcal/0104.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/PDF/Hrollcal/0604.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/PDF/Hrollcal/0605.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/PDF/Hrollcal/0629.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/PDF/Srollcal/0481.PDF.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback