IN SB0575 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Public Law 117
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Public Law 117
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Hospitals. Requires the executive board of the state department of health to amend a rule to reflect current private publications used in hospital licensure rules. Beginning May 1, 2020, provides that a hospital license expires every two years from the date of issuance. (Current law provides that a hospital license to expire one year after issuance.) Urges legislative council to assign the topic of hospital licensure to an interim study committee during the 2019 interim and sets forth requirements of the study.
Title
Hospitals. Requires the executive board of the state department of health to amend a rule to reflect current private publications used in hospital licensure rules. Beginning May 1, 2020, provides that a hospital license expires every two years from the date of issuance. (Current law provides that a hospital license to expire one year after issuance.) Urges legislative council to assign the topic of hospital licensure to an interim study committee during the 2019 interim and sets forth requirements of the study.
Sponsors
Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] | Sen. Michael Crider [R] | Sen. Eddie Melton [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Rep. Cindy Kirchhofer [R] | Rep. Timothy Brown [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Public Law 117 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-24 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 512: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2019-04-11 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2019-04-09 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 446: yeas 95, nays 1 |
2019-04-08 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-04-04 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-03-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Brown, T. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Kirchhofer |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 251: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senator Melton added as coauthor |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Charbonneau) prevailed; voice vote |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senator Crider added as second author |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-01-14 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Charbonneau |