IN SB0563 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 262
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Various motor vehicle issues.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Various motor vehicle issues.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-25 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Reread third time: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-13HousePublic Law 262
2013-05-11SenateSigned by the Governor
2013-05-03HouseSigned by the Speaker
2013-04-30SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2013-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2013-04-25HouseConference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 603: yeas 98, nays 0
2013-04-25SenateConference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 529: yeas 50, nays 0
2013-04-25HouseRules suspended
2013-04-11HouseHouse advisors appointed: Arnold, Goodin and Riecken
2013-04-11HouseHouse conferees appointed: Soliday and Stemler
2013-04-09SenateSenate advisors appointed: Delph and Crider
2013-04-09SenateSenate conferees appointed: Wyss and Arnold
2013-04-09SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2013-04-09SenateConcurrence withdrawn
2013-04-03SenateMotion to concur in House amendments filed
2013-03-26HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2013-03-26HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 356: yeas 95, nays 0
2013-03-25HouseAmendment 1 (Goodin), prevailed; voice vote
2013-03-25HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2013-03-21HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-02-26HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
2013-02-19SenateCosponsor: Rep. Stemler
2013-02-19SenateHouse sponsor: Rep. Soliday
2013-02-19SenateReferred to the House
2013-02-19SenateReread third time: passed; Roll Call 163: yeas 49, nays 0
2013-02-18SenateSenator Delph added as coauthor
2013-02-18SenateAmendment 6 (Arnold), prevailed; voice vote
2013-02-18SenateReread second time: amended, ordered engrossed
2013-02-11SenateThird reading: placed back on second reading
2013-02-11SenateThird reading: call withdrawn
2013-02-05SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-01-29SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-01-24SenateSenator Wyss added as second author
2013-01-14SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security, Transportation and Veterans Affairs
2013-01-14SenateAuthored by Senator Arnold

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.in.gov/apps/lsa/session/billwatch/billinfo?year=2013&session=1&request=getBill&doctype=SB&docno=0563
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/IN/IN0563.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/SB/SB0563.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/SB/SB0563.2.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/ES/ES0563.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/ES/ES0563.2.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/SE/SE0563.1.html
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Srollcal/0163.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Hrollcal/0356.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Srollcal/0529.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Hrollcal/0603.PDF.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback