IN SB0560 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 133
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for the establishment by counties of infrastructure development zones in which natural gas, broadband and advanced services, and water infrastructure is exempt from property taxation. Allows a customer of an electricity supplier that is: (1) a public utility; and (2) under the jurisdiction of the utility regulatory commission (commission) for the approval of rates and charges; to petition the commission for a temporary discount to the demand component of the customer's rates and charges established in the electricity supplier's applicable standard tariff for service to a single Indiana facility of the customer. Requires: (1) preapproval by the economic development corporation (IEDC) of the customer's requested temporary discount amount; and (2) that an electricity supplier defer the cost of a discount for subsequent recovery in its next general retail electric rate case. Requires the utility consumer counselor (counselor) to investigate a utility's petition for a transmission, distribution, and storage system improvement charge (TDSIC) and report its activities to the commission. Authorizes the counselor to request additional funding from the budget agency. Allows a utility to designate a test period for the commission to use in determining an increase in the utility's rates and charges. Provides that a utility may impose a temporary increase in rates and charges while its rate case is pending before the commission. Requires a utility to provide a refund, with interest, to customers if the temporary rates and charges exceed the rates and charges approved by the commission. Authorizes a utility that provides electric or gas service to petition the commission to recover TDSIC costs. Requires the utility to petition the commission for approval of a seven year plan for eligible transmission, distribution, and storage improvements. Requires the Indiana department of transportation to develop a program to coordinate the use of public rights-of-way with utilities when the department undertakes an infrastructure improvement project.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Utility transmission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 75 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - House - House - Amendment 2 (Dvorak), failed (Y: 26 N: 67 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2013-03-18 - House - House - Amendment 1 (Dvorak), failed (Y: 30 N: 63 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2013-03-18 - House - House - Amendment 7 (Pierce), failed (Y: 22 N: 71 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2013-03-18 - House - House - Amendment 4 (Riecken), failed (Y: 29 N: 63 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House - Roll Call 281 (Y: 65 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-13HousePublic Law 133
2013-04-30SenateSigned by the Governor
2013-04-22SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2013-04-17HouseSigned by the Speaker
2013-04-16SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2013-04-11SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 466: yeas 42, nays 7
2013-04-09SenateMotion to concur in House amendments filed
2013-03-19HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2013-03-19HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 306: yeas 75, nays 21
2013-03-18HouseAmendment 2 (Dvorak), failed; Roll Call 284: yeas 26, nays 67
2013-03-18HouseAmendment 1 (Dvorak), failed; Roll Call 283: yeas 30, nays 63
2013-03-18HouseAmendment 7 (Pierce), failed; Roll Call 282: yeas 22, nays 71
2013-03-18HouseAmendment 5 (Pierce), failed; voice vote
2013-03-18HouseRuling of the Chair appealed. Ruling sustained; Roll Call 281: yeas 65, nays 29
2013-03-18HouseAmendment 12 (Riecken), ruled out of order
2013-03-18HouseAmendment 4 (Riecken), failed; Roll Call 280: yeas 29, nays 63
2013-03-18HouseAmendment 11 (Koch), prevailed; voice vote
2013-03-18HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2013-03-14HouseRepresentative VanDenburgh added as cosponsor
2013-03-14HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-03-05HouseRepresentative Battles added as cosponsor
2013-02-26HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Utilities and Energy
2013-02-12SenateSenator Wyss added as coauthor
2013-02-12SenateCosponsor: Rep. VanNatter
2013-02-12SenateHouse sponsor: Rep. Koch
2013-02-12SenateReferred to the House
2013-02-12SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 121: yeas 37 and nays 12
2013-02-11SenateAmendment 6 (Breaux), rejected; voice vote
2013-02-11SenateAmendment 1 (Breaux), rejected; voice vote
2013-02-11SenateAmendment 9 (Hershman), prevailed; voice vote
2013-02-11SenateAmendment 8 (Hershman), prevailed; voice vote
2013-02-11SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2013-02-07SenateSenator Merritt added as second author
2013-02-04SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-01-14SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Utilities
2013-01-14SenateAuthored by Senator Hershman

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.in.gov/apps/lsa/session/billwatch/billinfo?year=2013&session=1&request=getBill&doctype=SB&docno=0560
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/IN/IN0560.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/SB/SB0560.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/SB/SB0560.2.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/ES/ES0560.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/ES/ES0560.2.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/SE/SE0560.1.html
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Srollcal/0121.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Hrollcal/0280.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Hrollcal/0281.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Hrollcal/0282.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Hrollcal/0283.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Hrollcal/0284.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Hrollcal/0306.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Srollcal/0466.PDF.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback