IN SB0554 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 204
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the office of Medicaid policy and planning (office) to reimburse a home health agency for telehealth services under the Medicaid program. Requires the office to reimburse a federally qualified health center, a rural health clinic, a community mental health center, and a critical access hospital for telemedicine services under the Medicaid program regardless of the distance between the provider and the patient. Requires the health finance commission to study during the 2013 legislative interim issues concerning extending telehealth and telemedicine services under the Medicaid program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Telehealth and telemedicine services reimbursement under Medicaid.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-24 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-13HousePublic Law 204
2013-05-08SenateSigned by the Governor
2013-05-01SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2013-04-29HouseSigned by the Speaker
2013-04-26SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2013-04-24SenateConference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 518: yeas 49, nays 0
2013-04-24HouseConference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 585: yeas 96, nays 0
2013-04-24HouseRules suspended
2013-04-09HouseHouse advisors appointed: Clere, Porter and Shackleford
2013-04-09HouseHouse conferees appointed: Bacon and C. Brown
2013-03-28SenateSenate advisor appointed: Grooms and Hume
2013-03-28SenateSenate conferee appointed: Becker and Breaux
2013-03-28SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2013-03-25HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2013-03-25HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 333: yeas 94, nays 0
2013-03-21HouseAmendment 1 (Bacon), prevailed; voice vote
2013-03-21HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2013-03-18HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-03-05HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2013-02-26SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2013-02-26SenateCosponsors: Reps. C. Brown, T. Brown and Porter
2013-02-26SenateHouse sponsor: Rep. Bacon
2013-02-26SenateReferred to the House
2013-02-26SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 243: yeas 50 and nays 0
2013-02-25SenateSenator Tallian added as coauthor
2013-02-25SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-02-21SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2013-02-12SenateSenator Hershman added as coauthor
2013-02-07SenateSenators Pat Miller, Charbonneau and Grooms added as coauthors
2013-02-07SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
2013-02-05SenateSenator Breaux added as coauthor
2013-02-05SenateSenator Leising added as second author
2013-01-14SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2013-01-14SenateAuthored by Senator Becker

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.in.gov/apps/lsa/session/billwatch/billinfo?year=2013&session=1&request=getBill&doctype=SB&docno=0554
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/IN/IN0554.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/SB/SB0554.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/SB/SB0554.2.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/ES/ES0554.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/ES/ES0554.2.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/SE/SE0554.1.html
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Srollcal/0243.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Hrollcal/0333.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Srollcal/0518.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Hrollcal/0585.PDF.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback