IN SB0549 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Public Law 101
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

School financial matters. Requires the superintendent of a school corporation to submit a written report to the local board of finance for the school corporation. Provides that the report must assess the financial condition of the school corporation using certain fiscal and qualitative indicators. Provides that the report must be received and reviewed at the annual meeting of the local board of finance for the school corporation. Urges the legislative council to assign to the appropriate interim study committee the task of identifying and studying best practices in: (1) the governance structure and oversight of tax increment financing to promote transparency and economic development in Indiana; and (2) reporting mechanisms between local government units to facilitate better collaboration and decision making.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School financial matters. Requires the superintendent of a school corporation to submit a written report to the local board of finance for the school corporation. Provides that the report must assess the financial condition of the school corporation using certain fiscal and qualitative indicators. Provides that the report must be received and reviewed at the annual meeting of the local board of finance for the school corporation. Urges the legislative council to assign to the appropriate interim study committee the task of identifying and studying best practices in: (1) the governance structure and oversight of tax increment financing to promote transparency and economic development in Indiana; and (2) reporting mechanisms between local government units to facilitate better collaboration and decision making.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25SenatePublic Law 101
2019-04-25SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-04-24SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-16HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-15SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-12HouseReturned to the Senate without amendments
2019-04-11HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 485: yeas 91, nays 0
2019-04-10HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-04-08HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-03-05HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2019-02-20SenateReferred to the House
2019-02-19SenateSenator Raatz added as coauthor
2019-02-19SenateCosponsor: Representative Mahan
2019-02-19SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Cook
2019-02-19SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 163: yeas 40, nays 0
2019-02-18SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-14SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2019-02-14SenateSenator Koch added as coauthor
2019-02-12SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-02-11SenateSenator Bassler added as second author
2019-01-14SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
2019-01-14SenateAuthored by Senator Spartz

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/senate/549/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/0/6/c/506c1ef6/SB0549.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/8/a/b/28ab07c0/SB0549.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/6/e/2/86e24b97/SB0549.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/0/0/6/b006c67e/SB0549.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/f/0/7/5f07396c/SB0549.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/e/1/e/1e1eb231/SB0549.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/5/0/c/f50ce0d4/SB0549.04.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/4/b/6/c4b6d99a/SB0549.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/e/8/e/6e8e37ca/SB0549.163.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/9/1/3/79132565/SB0549.02.COMS.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/2/8/0/4280d0d7/SB0549.485.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback