IN SB0549 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Public Law 76
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Public Law 76
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Health record information. Amends the definition of "abandoned" for purposes of protection of health records possessed by a health care provider or a former health care provider. Permits the attorney general to file an action against a health care provider or former health care provider to recover incurred costs related to abandoned records. Applies current law concerning data base security to a health care provider or former health care provider who is a data base owner currently exempt from the law if the data base owner does not have or implement a plan to safeguard personal information after ceasing to
Title
Health record information. Amends the definition of "abandoned" for purposes of protection of health records possessed by a health care provider or a former health care provider. Permits the attorney general to file an action against a health care provider or former health care provider to recover incurred costs related to abandoned records. Applies current law concerning data base security to a health care provider or former health care provider who is a data base owner currently exempt from the law if the data base owner does not have or implement a plan to safeguard personal information after ceasing to
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Sandlin [R] | Sen. Aaron Freeman [R] | Sen. Greg Taylor [D] | Rep. Mike Speedy [R] |
Rep. Terri Jo Austin [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | Senate | Public Law 76 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 358: yeas 46, nays 1 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2017-03-22 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2017-03-21 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 295: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2017-03-20 | House | Amendment #1 (Speedy) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-03-20 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2017-03-13 | House | Representative Austin added as cosponsor |
2017-03-09 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-02-28 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2017-02-06 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Speedy |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 72: yeas 47, nays 1 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senator Taylor G added as coauthor |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senator Freeman added as second author |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-01-17 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Civil Law |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Authored by Senator Sandlin |