IN SB0544 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 261
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 261
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
State and local tax administration.
Title
State and local tax administration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-26 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 261 |
2013-05-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-05-03 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-04-26 | House | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 649: yeas 98, nays 0 |
2013-04-26 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 573: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Senator Walker added as second author |
2013-04-18 | House | House advisors appointed: Turner, Negele, Niezgodski, Klinker and Goodin |
2013-04-18 | House | House conferees appointed: T. Brown and Porter |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate advisor appointed: Pete Miller and Broden |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate conferee appointed: Hershman and Skinner |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2013-04-11 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2013-04-11 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 464: yeas 97, nays 0 |
2013-04-10 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-04-08 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-02-26 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2013-02-21 | Senate | House sponsor: Rep. T. Brown |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 174: yeas 48 and nays 0 |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-01-14 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Hershman |