IN SB0539 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-21 - Public Law 128
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-21 - Public Law 128
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Notaries public and trademarks. Provides that a person who wishes to register a trademark must file an electronic application for the registration of the trademark. Allows the governor to appoint notaries public in certain instances. Describes permitted notarial acts. Provides that notarial acts performed in another state are presumptively valid in certain instances. Provides that notarial acts performed: (1) under the authority of; and (2) within the jurisdiction of; a federally recognized tribe are presumptively valid in certain instances. Provides that notarial acts performed by foreign governments or nations are presumptively valid in certain instances. Specifies records should be notarized.
Title
Notaries public and trademarks. Provides that a person who wishes to register a trademark must file an electronic application for the registration of the trademark. Allows the governor to appoint notaries public in certain instances. Describes permitted notarial acts. Provides that notarial acts performed in another state are presumptively valid in certain instances. Provides that notarial acts performed: (1) under the authority of; and (2) within the jurisdiction of; a federally recognized tribe are presumptively valid in certain instances. Provides that notarial acts performed by foreign governments or nations are presumptively valid in certain instances. Specifies records should be notarized.
Sponsors
Sen. Rodric Bray [R] | Sen. Elizabeth Brown [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Rep. Martin Carbaugh [R] |
Rep. Gregory Steuerwald [R] | Rep. Thomas Washburne [R] | Rep. Sheila Klinker [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 85 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 85 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-21 | Senate | Public Law 128 |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 458: yeas 43, nays 5 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2017-03-30 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2017-03-30 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 343: yeas 85, nays 4 |
2017-03-28 | House | Amendment #2 (Torr) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-03-28 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2017-03-20 | House | Representative Klinker added as cosponsor |
2017-03-20 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-03-09 | House | Representative Washburne added as cosponsor |
2017-03-09 | House | Representative Carbaugh added as sponsor |
2017-03-09 | House | Representative Washburne removed as sponsor |
2017-02-28 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Steuerwald |
2017-02-09 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Washburne |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 87: yeas 44, nays 3 |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Bray) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Senator Brown L added as second author |
2017-01-17 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bray |