IN SB0514 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Public Law 120
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Public Law 120
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Vacancy in office of clerk-treasurer. Provides that if a town legislative body is unable to fill a vacancy in the office of town clerk-treasurer, a town legislative body member may serve ex officio as the town clerk-treasurer for the remainder of the clerk-treasurer's term. Provides that the town legislative body member may not receive additional compensation for serving as the ex officio town clerk-treasurer. Provides that the duties assumed by the town legislative body member are duties of the office of town legislative body member and do not constitute a second lucrative office. Allows the town legislative body to enter
Title
Vacancy in office of clerk-treasurer. Provides that if a town legislative body is unable to fill a vacancy in the office of town clerk-treasurer, a town legislative body member may serve ex officio as the town clerk-treasurer for the remainder of the clerk-treasurer's term. Provides that the town legislative body member may not receive additional compensation for serving as the ex officio town clerk-treasurer. Provides that the duties assumed by the town legislative body member are duties of the office of town legislative body member and do not constitute a second lucrative office. Allows the town legislative body to enter
Sponsors
Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] | Sen. Randall Head [R] | Sen. James Buck [R] | Sen. Jean Breaux [D] |
Rep. John Price [R] | Rep. Randy Truitt [R] | Rep. Dennis Zent [R] | Rep. Melanie Wright [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-09 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 41 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Local Government - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 41 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Local Government - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-04 | Senate | Public Law 120 |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-04-10 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2015-04-09 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 392: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2015-04-07 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-04-02 | House | Representative Wright added as cosponsor |
2015-04-02 | House | Representative Zent added as cosponsor |
2015-04-02 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-03-05 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as coauthor |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Representative Truitt added as cosponsor |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Senator Buck added as third author |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Representative Price added as sponsor |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 98: yeas 41, nays 7 |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Senator Head added as second author |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-01-14 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Charbonneau |