IN SB0507 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-12 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-12 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Attorney and judicial discipline complaints. Permits a prosecuting attorney and a county public defender (including a contract public defender) to seek reimbursement from the state for reasonable attorney's fees incurred in defending against a charge of attorney misconduct if: (1) the alleged misconduct relates to the person's official duties or status as a prosecuting attorney or public defender; (2) the charge of misconduct does not result in a sanction (except for a private reprimand); and (3) the attorney general approves the reimbursement.
Title
Attorney and judicial discipline complaints. Permits a prosecuting attorney and a county public defender (including a contract public defender) to seek reimbursement from the state for reasonable attorney's fees incurred in defending against a charge of attorney misconduct if: (1) the alleged misconduct relates to the person's official duties or status as a prosecuting attorney or public defender; (2) the charge of misconduct does not result in a sanction (except for a private reprimand); and (3) the attorney general approves the reimbursement.
Sponsors
Sen. Rodric Bray [R] | Sen. Susan Glick [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Rep. Casey Cox [R] |
Rep. Peggy Mayfield [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Representative Mayfield added as cosponsor |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Representative Cox added as sponsor |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 262: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Senator Glick added as second author |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to committee on Appropriations |
2015-01-14 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bray |