IN SB0502 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-08-21 - Bill Withdrawn
Pending: Senate Commerce & Economic Development Committee

Summary

Provides that all goods grown, manufactured, or made in Indiana and all services performed in Indiana, when the goods or services are sold, maintained, or retained in Indiana are not subject to the authority of the Congress of the United States under its constitutional power to regulate commerce. Provides that a person who knowingly or intentionally enforces or attempts to enforce an act, order, law, rule, or regulation of the United States purporting to regulate Indiana goods or services commits a Class D felony.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Federal interference in intrastate commerce.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-08-21 Bill Withdrawn
2011-08-14 Bill Withdrawn
2011-08-07 Bill Withdrawn
2011-07-31 Bill Withdrawn
2011-07-20 Bill Withdrawn
2011-07-13 Bill Withdrawn
2011-07-06 Bill Withdrawn
2011-06-28 Bill Withdrawn
2011-06-21 Bill Withdrawn
2011-06-14 Bill Withdrawn
2011-06-07 Bill Withdrawn
2011-05-31 Bill Withdrawn
2011-05-23 Bill Withdrawn
2011-05-15 Bill Withdrawn
2011-05-07 Bill Withdrawn
2011-02-04 Bill Withdrawn
2011-01-13 First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce & Economic Development
2011-01-13 Authored by Senator Miller

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback