IN SB0496 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-28 - First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-28 - First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Psychotropic medication and the commission to combat drug abuse. Provides that the chairperson of the Indiana commission to combat drug abuse (commission) is a member appointed by the governor who is either the executive director for drug prevention, treatment, and enforcement or a member of the governor's staff. (Current law provides that the chairperson is a member of the governor's staff.) Specifies that the commission: (1) shall meet at the call of the chairperson, but at least four times in a calendar year; and (2) shall approve requests for substance abuse treatment and prevention programs. Allows limitations to be placed
Title
Psychotropic medication and the commission to combat drug abuse. Provides that the chairperson of the Indiana commission to combat drug abuse (commission) is a member appointed by the governor who is either the executive director for drug prevention, treatment, and enforcement or a member of the governor's staff. (Current law provides that the chairperson is a member of the governor's staff.) Specifies that the commission: (1) shall meet at the call of the chairperson, but at least four times in a calendar year; and (2) shall approve requests for substance abuse treatment and prevention programs. Allows limitations to be placed
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 41 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senator Houchin added as second author |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Clere and Stemler |
2017-02-21 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Davisson |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 166: yeas 41, nays 7 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senator Niezgodski added as coauthor |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senator Walker added as coauthor |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as coauthor |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Senator Head added as coauthor |
2017-01-17 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Authored by Senator Grooms |