IN SB0495 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits the governing body of a school corporation from using funds received from the state to bring or join in an action against the state unless the school corporation is challenging an adverse decision by a state agency, board, or commission..

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lawsuits by school corporations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-12 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 67 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 33 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-18 Effective 07/01/2011
2011-05-17 Public Law 69
2011-04-26 Signed by the Governor
2011-04-19 Signed by the President of the Senate
2011-04-18 Signed by the Speaker
2011-04-14 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2011-04-12 Returned to the Senate without amendments
2011-04-12 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 490: yeas 67, nays 26
2011-04-11 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2011-04-07 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2011-03-28 First reading: referred to Committee on Education
2011-02-17 Cosponsor: Rep. Frizzell
2011-02-17 House sponsor: Rep. Behning
2011-02-17 Referred to the House
2011-02-17 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 158: yeas 33 and nays 16
2011-02-15 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2011-02-14 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2011-01-24 Senator Banks added as third author
2011-01-24 Senator Yoder added as second author
2011-01-13 First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2011-01-13 Authored by Senator Kruse

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback