IN SB0494 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-28 - First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
Pending: House Roads and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-28 - First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
Pending: House Roads and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Transportation corridor planning. Repeals on July 1, 2017, the statute concerning transportation corridor planning. Provides that the repeal of the statute does not affect: (1) rights or liabilities accrued; (2) proceedings begun; or (3) project agreements or other contracts executed; under the statute before its repeal. Specifies that any funds: (1) remaining on July 1, 2017, in the transportation corridor fund; and (2) not committed, dedicated, or appropriated for, or otherwise needed to fulfill an obligation arising from, any project agreement or other contract executed under the statute before its repeal; revert to the state general fund. Moves to the
Title
Transportation corridor planning. Repeals on July 1, 2017, the statute concerning transportation corridor planning. Provides that the repeal of the statute does not affect: (1) rights or liabilities accrued; (2) proceedings begun; or (3) project agreements or other contracts executed; under the statute before its repeal. Specifies that any funds: (1) remaining on July 1, 2017, in the transportation corridor fund; and (2) not committed, dedicated, or appropriated for, or otherwise needed to fulfill an obligation arising from, any project agreement or other contract executed under the statute before its repeal; revert to the state general fund. Moves to the
Sponsors
Sen. Jean Breaux [D] | Sen. Michael Crider [R] | Sen. Jon Ford [R] | Sen. Jack Sandlin [R] |
Sen. Mark Stoops [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Rep. Robin Shackleford [D] | Rep. Carey Hamilton [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Hamilton |
2017-02-21 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Shackleford |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 165: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as coauthor |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Breaux) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senators Ford and Sandlin added as coauthors |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senator Crider added as second author |
2017-01-17 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Authored by Senator Breaux |