IN SB0494 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that it is an unfair practice for an automotive manufacturer or distributor to fail to pay all claims made by an automotive dealer (dealer) for compensation for incentive payments within 30 days after approval. Authorizes an automotive manufacturer or distributor to: (1) audit claims made by a dealer for warranty work or incentive payments for up to one year after the date on which a claim is paid; or (2) charge back to a dealer any amounts paid on false or materially unsubstantiated claims for warranty work or incentive payments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle manufacturers and distributors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-12 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-18 Effective 07/01/2011
2011-05-17 Public Law 68
2011-04-26 Signed by the Governor
2011-04-19 Signed by the President of the Senate
2011-04-18 Signed by the Speaker
2011-04-14 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2011-04-12 Returned to the Senate without amendments
2011-04-12 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 489: yeas 92, nays 0
2011-04-11 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2011-04-08 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2011-03-28 First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce, Small Business and Economic Development
2011-02-22 House sponsor: Rep. Torr
2011-02-22 Referred to the House
2011-02-22 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 207: yeas 48 and nays 0
2011-02-21 Senator Wyss added as second author
2011-02-17 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2011-02-15 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2011-01-13 First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce & Economic Development
2011-01-13 Authored by Senator Merritt

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback