IN SB0492 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Senator Mrvan added as coauthor
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Veterans cemetery funding. Makes an appropriation from the state general fund to the Indiana department of veterans' affairs to be used for the establishment, operation, and maintenance of a veterans cemetery at Oak Hill Cemetery in Evansville.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterans cemetery funding. Makes an appropriation from the state general fund to the Indiana department of veterans' affairs to be used for the establishment, operation, and maintenance of a veterans cemetery at Oak Hill Cemetery in Evansville.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14SenateSenator Mrvan added as coauthor
2019-01-28SenateSenator Becker added as coauthor
2019-01-24SenateSenator Doriot added as third author
2019-01-24SenateSenator Sandlin added as second author
2019-01-22SenateCommittee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-14SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and The Military
2019-01-14SenateAuthored by Senator Tomes

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback