IN SB0486 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-28 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-28 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the weight enforcement fund (fund) for funding personnel and equipment necessary for enforcement of laws concerning heavy trucks, to be administered by the state police department. Provides for the collection of a $10 fee from certain permits and annual registration for heavy trucks to be deposited in the fund.
Title
Fees for heavy vehicles.
Sponsors
Sen. John Broden [D] | Sen. Thomas Wyss [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means | |
2011-02-17 | Cosponsor: Rep. Pflum | |
2011-02-17 | House sponsor: Rep. Soliday | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to the House | |
2011-02-17 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 157: yeas 37 and nays 13 | |
2011-02-15 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-02-14 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-02-07 | Senator Broden added as second author | |
2011-01-31 | Committee report: amend do pass, reassigned to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-01-13 | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security, Transportation and Veterans Affairs | |
2011-01-13 | Authored by Senator Wyss |