IN SB0485 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the Indiana library and historical board to establish a nonprofit foundation to solicit and accept private funding. Allows certain funds to be transferred to the foundation. Provides that the foundation is governed by a board of directors. Requires the state board of accounts to annually audit the foundation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State library foundation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-08 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-18 Effective 07/01/2011
2011-05-17 Public Law 47
2011-04-20 Signed by the Governor
2011-04-15 Signed by the President of the Senate
2011-04-13 Signed by the Speaker
2011-04-12 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2011-04-08 Returned to the Senate without amendments
2011-04-08 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 450: yeas 89, nays 0
2011-04-07 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2011-04-04 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2011-03-28 First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
2011-02-17 Cosponsor: Rep. Pierce
2011-02-17 House sponsor: Rep. Saunders
2011-02-17 Referred to the House
2011-02-17 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 156: yeas 50 and nays 0
2011-02-15 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2011-02-14 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2011-01-18 Senator Simpson added as coauthor
2011-01-18 Senator Lawson added as second author
2011-01-13 First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
2011-01-13 Authored by Senator Gard

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback