IN SB0484 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Allows the state department of health to: (1) work with a national lupus organization in educating the public, health care providers, and human services providers about lupus; (2) distribute information concerning lupus on the state department's Internet web site to certain persons; and (3) accept grants and seek waivers for the purposes of educating the public about lupus. Allows the state department of health to: (1) work with a Parkinson's disease organization in educating the public, health care providers, and human services providers about Parkinson's disease (2) distribute information concerning Parkinson's disease on the state department's Internet web site to certain persons; and (3) accept grants and seek waivers for the purposes of educating the public about Parkinson's disease.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lupus and Parkinson's disease education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-18 Effective 07/01/2011
2011-05-17 Public Law 108
2011-05-09 Signed by the Governor
2011-05-02 Signed by the President of the Senate
2011-04-27 Signed by the Speaker
2011-04-26 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2011-04-25 Pursuant to Senate Rule 35(c); Technical Correction
2011-04-19 Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 384: yeas 48, nays 0
2011-04-12 Motion to concur in House amendments filed
2011-04-08 Returned to the Senate with amendments
2011-04-08 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 449: yeas 90, nays 0
2011-04-07 Amendment 1 (Friend), prevailed; voice vote
2011-04-07 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2011-04-04 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2011-03-28 First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2011-02-22 Senator Randolph added as coauthor
2011-02-22 Cosponsor: Rep. VanDenburgh
2011-02-22 House sponsor: Rep. Ellspermann
2011-02-22 Referred to the House
2011-02-22 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 241: yeas 49 and nays 0
2011-02-21 Senator Charbonneau added as coauthor
2011-02-21 Senator Rogers added as second author
2011-02-21 Senator Breaux added as coauthor
2011-02-21 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2011-02-17 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2011-01-13 First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2011-01-13 Authored by Senator Lawson

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback