IN SB0481 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective retroactive to 01/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Specifies that a wind power device does not qualify for the assessed value deduction if it is owned or operated by: (1) a public utility; or (2) another entity that provides electricity at wholesale or retail for consideration, other than a person who participates in a net metering program offered by an electric utility.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wind power device exemption.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-08 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-18 Effective retroactive to 01/01/2010
2011-05-17 Public Law 46
2011-04-20 Signed by the Governor
2011-04-15 Signed by the President of the Senate
2011-04-13 Signed by the Speaker
2011-04-12 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2011-04-08 Returned to the Senate without amendments
2011-04-08 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 448: yeas 89, nays 0
2011-04-07 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2011-04-05 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2011-03-28 First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities and Energy
2011-02-03 Senator Waterman added as coauthor
2011-02-03 House sponsor: Rep. Lehe
2011-02-03 Referred to the House
2011-02-03 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 70: yeas 48 and nays 0
2011-01-31 Amendment 1 (Hershman), prevailed;
2011-01-31 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2011-01-27 Senators Breaux and Landske added as coauthors
2011-01-25 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2011-01-13 First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
2011-01-13 Authored by Senator Hershman

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback