IN SB0480 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the utility regulatory commission (IURC) to delegate authority to its staff to grant certain requests concerning telephone numbers. Provides that actions taken by the staff are appealable to the IURC. Specifies the information that the IURC may require certain communications service providers to include in applications for certificates of territorial authority. Provides that the IURC may not require a video service provider to disclose more frequently than in each odd numbered year information regarding the areas in which an applicant for a video service franchise has deployed, or plans to deploy, video service. Specifies that a video service provider or an applicant for a video service franchise may not be required to disclose information that identifies at a certain level of specificity the areas in which the provider or applicant has deployed, or plans to deploy, video service in Indiana. Grants jurisdiction to resolve certain matters concerning video service franchises to the IURC rather than a court with jurisdiction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Various communications matters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-25 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 87 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - House - Amendment 1 (Pierce), failed (Y: 26 N: 64 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-04-07 - House - House - Roll Call 411: yeas 54, nays 36 (Y: 54 N: 36 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-18 Effective 07/01/2011
2011-05-17 Public Law 219
2011-05-13 Signed by the Governor
2011-05-05 Signed by the President of the Senate
2011-05-05 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2011-05-05 Signed by the Speaker
2011-04-29 Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House
2011-04-27 Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate
2011-04-25 Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 467: yeas 48, nays 2
2011-04-19 Motion to concur in House amendments filed
2011-04-13 Returned to the Senate with amendments
2011-04-13 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 526: yeas 87, nays 10
2011-04-12 Amendment 1 (Pierce), failed; Roll Call 469: yeas 26, nays 64
2011-04-12 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2011-04-07 Roll Call 411: yeas 54, nays 36
2011-04-07 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2011-03-28 First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities and Energy
2011-02-22 Cosponsor: Rep. Soliday
2011-02-22 House sponsor: Rep. Koch
2011-02-22 Referred to the House
2011-02-22 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 206: yeas 46 and nays 1
2011-02-21 Senator Merritt added as second author
2011-02-21 Senator Merritt removed as coauthor
2011-02-17 Amendment 3 (Hershman), prevailed;
2011-02-17 Amendment 2 (Hershman), prevailed;
2011-02-17 Amendment 1 (Hershman), prevailed;
2011-02-17 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2011-02-14 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2011-01-25 Senators Merritt and R. Young added as coauthors
2011-01-13 First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities & Technology
2011-01-13 Authored by Senator Hershman

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.in.gov/apps/lsa/session/billwatch/billinfo?year=2011&session=1&request=getBill&doctype=SB&docno=0480
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/IN/IN0480.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/SB/SB0480.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/SB/SB0480.2.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/ES/ES0480.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/SE/SE0480.1.html
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/PDF/Srollcal/0206.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/PDF/Hrollcal/0411.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/PDF/Hrollcal/0469.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/PDF/Hrollcal/0526.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/PDF/Srollcal/0467.PDF.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback