IN SB0478 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the state fair commission (commission) to establish a nonprofit subsidiary corporation to solicit and accept private funding. Provides that the members of the commission are the members of the board of directors of the subsidiary corporation. Requires the state board of accounts to annually audit the subsidiary corporation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State fair foundation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-04 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-18 Effective 07/01/2011
2011-05-17 Public Law 20
2011-04-15 Signed by the Governor
2011-04-12 Signed by the President of the Senate
2011-04-08 Signed by the Speaker
2011-04-07 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2011-04-05 Representative Porter added as cosponsor
2011-04-04 Representative Battles added as cosponsor
2011-04-04 Returned to the Senate without amendments
2011-04-04 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 398: yeas 98, nays 0
2011-03-31 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2011-03-29 Representative R. Frye added as cosponsor
2011-03-29 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2011-03-28 First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development
2011-02-15 House sponsor: Rep. Cherry
2011-02-15 Referred to the House
2011-02-15 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 131: yeas 50 and nays 0
2011-02-14 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2011-02-08 Senator Taylor added as coauthor
2011-02-03 Senator Leising added as third author
2011-02-03 Senator M. Young added as second author
2011-02-03 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2011-01-13 First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce & Economic Development
2011-01-13 Authored by Senator Merritt

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback