IN SB0471 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Public Law 276
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Offenses involving critical infrastructure. Repeals the term "key facility" and replaces it with "critical infrastructure facility". Defines "critical infrastructure facility". Provides that a person who, not having a contractual interest in the property, knowingly or intentionally enters the real property of a critical infrastructure facility without the permission of the owner of the critical infrastructure facility or an authorized person commits the offense of critical infrastructure facility trespass. Provides that a person who recklessly, knowingly, or intentionally damages or defaces property of a critical infrastructure facility commits the offense of critical infrastructure facility mischief. Provides criminal penalties and civil remedies for offenses involving a critical infrastructure facility. Provides that the chapter addressing offenses of related critical infrastructure facilities does not apply to protected conduct or collective bargaining agreements. Provides that a victim of the offense of critical infrastructure facility trespass or mischief may recover damages sustained from a person who caused the loss. Provides that a person that compensates, provides consideration to, or remunerates a person for committing the offense of critical infrastructure facility trespass or mischief may be held liable for civil damages. Provides that if a person commits the offense of conspiracy to commit the offense of critical infrastructure facility trespass or mischief with a person who commits the offense of critical infrastructure facility trespass or mischief, the conspiring person shall be punished by a fine not to exceed $100,000.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Offenses involving critical infrastructure. Repeals the term "key facility" and replaces it with "critical infrastructure facility". Defines "critical infrastructure facility". Provides that a person who, not having a contractual interest in the property, knowingly or intentionally enters the real property of a critical infrastructure facility without the permission of the owner of the critical infrastructure facility or an authorized person commits the offense of critical infrastructure facility trespass. Provides that a person who recklessly, knowingly, or intentionally damages or defaces property of a critical infrastructure facility commits the offense of critical infrastructure facility mischief. Provides criminal penalties and civil remedies for offenses involving a critical infrastructure facility. Provides that the chapter addressing offenses of related critical infrastructure facilities does not apply to protected conduct or collective bargaining agreements. Provides that a victim of the offense of critical infrastructure facility trespass or mischief may recover damages sustained from a person who caused the loss. Provides that a person that compensates, provides consideration to, or remunerates a person for committing the offense of critical infrastructure facility trespass or mischief may be held liable for civil damages. Provides that if a person commits the offense of conspiracy to commit the offense of critical infrastructure facility trespass or mischief with a person who commits the offense of critical infrastructure facility trespass or mischief, the conspiring person shall be punished by a fine not to exceed $100,000.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 39 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 69 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06SenatePublic Law 276
2019-05-06SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-08HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-04SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-01SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 366: yeas 39, nays 7
2019-03-29SenateMotion to concur filed
2019-03-26HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2019-03-25HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 343: yeas 69, nays 27
2019-03-21HouseRepresentatives Frye and Pressel added as cosponsors
2019-03-21HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-03-19HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-11SenateReferred to the House
2019-02-07SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Soliday
2019-02-07SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 92: yeas 49, nays 0
2019-02-05SenateAmendment #1 (Koch) prevailed; voice vote
2019-02-05SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-01-31SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-29SenateSenator Crider added as second author
2019-01-14SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
2019-01-14SenateAuthored by Senator Koch

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/senate/471/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/8/1/1/f811407b/SB0471.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/d/e/4/3de4435b/SB0471.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/d/b/9/9db98848/SB0471.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/c/4/9/ac49fa53/SB0471.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/0/2/7/7027f6d0/SB0471.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/8/b/7/48b7cf3c/SB0471.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/2/5/7/c25786ce/SB0471.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/3/e/d/a3ed4042/SB0471.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/b/9/5/1b952623/SB0471.05.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/4/4/5/d44512e3/SB0471.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/d/0/b/3d0b949d/SB0471.92.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/3/8/5/638559bf/SB0471.03.ENGS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/b/c/a/1bca2ae4/SB0471.343.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/c/7/1/2c71c104/SB0471.366.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback