IN SB0465 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Makes changes to the laws concerning: (1) guardianship of a minor; (2) regulation of child caring institutions, foster family homes, including therapeutic and special needs foster family homes, group homes, and child placing agencies; (3) adoption; (4) incentive payments to counties for enforcing and collecting child support; (5) juvenile court jurisdiction; (6) child abuse and neglect reporting and investigation; (7) the child protection index; (8) placement of a child in need of services; (9) notification requirements regarding proceedings on motions for child testimony by closed circuit television; and (10) placement of a child that is a delinquent child. Provides that a county domestic violence fatality review team shall review cases in which a person who committed suicide was a victim of an act of domestic violence. Permits a court to require a noncustodial parent who has been convicted of certain crimes of domestic violence to require the parent to attend a batterer's intervention program certified by the Indiana coalition against domestic violence as a condition of receiving unsupervised visitation time. Requires that a batterer's intervention program to which a court may order a person to attend must be certified by the Indiana coalition against domestic violence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of child services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 80 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-18 Effective 07/01/2011
2011-05-17 Public Law 162
2011-05-10 Signed by the Governor
2011-05-02 Signed by the President of the Senate
2011-04-27 Signed by the Speaker
2011-04-26 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2011-04-19 Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 383: yeas 48, nays 0
2011-04-14 Motion to concur in House amendments filed
2011-04-13 Returned to the Senate with amendments
2011-04-13 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 525: yeas 80, nays 18
2011-04-12 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2011-04-08 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2011-04-04 Representative Noe added as cosponsor
2011-03-28 First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs
2011-02-17 Cosponsor: Rep. VanDenburgh
2011-02-17 House sponsor: Rep. McNamara
2011-02-17 Referred to the House
2011-02-17 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 154: yeas 49 and nays 1
2011-02-15 Senator Lanane added as coauthor
2011-02-15 Senator Becker added as second author
2011-02-15 Amendment 1 (Lawson C), prevailed;
2011-02-15 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2011-02-14 Senator Randolph added as coauthor
2011-02-14 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2011-01-13 First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2011-01-13 Authored by Senator Lawson

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback