IN SB0460 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Public Law 257
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Comprehensive care health facilities. Prohibits the state department of health from approving: (1) the licensure of comprehensive care health facilities; (2) new or converted comprehensive care beds; or (3) the certification of new or converted comprehensive care beds for participation in the state Medicaid program; through June 30, 2018. Makes exceptions for certain facilities that are: (1) under development; (2) small house health facilities; (3) replacement facilities; (4) continuing care retirement communities; (5) facilities located in counties whose comprehensive care bed occupancy rate exceeds 90%; and (6) facilities that undergo a change of ownership for certain purposes. Limits small house

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Comprehensive care health facilities. Prohibits the state department of health from approving: (1) the licensure of comprehensive care health facilities; (2) new or converted comprehensive care beds; or (3) the certification of new or converted comprehensive care beds for participation in the state Medicaid program; through June 30, 2018. Makes exceptions for certain facilities that are: (1) under development; (2) small house health facilities; (3) replacement facilities; (4) continuing care retirement communities; (5) facilities located in counties whose comprehensive care bed occupancy rate exceeds 90%; and (6) facilities that undergo a change of ownership for certain purposes. Limits small house

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Concur in House Amendments (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 52 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - House - Amendment #3 (VanNatter) failed (Y: 37 N: 51 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2015-03-16 - House - House - Amendment #9 (Slager) failed (Y: 41 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2015-03-11 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House Committee on Public Health - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Provider Services - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-12SenatePublic Law 257
2015-05-12SenateBill Became Law on 8th Day Without Signature
2015-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-04-09HouseSigned by the Speaker
2015-04-08SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2015-03-31SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 364: yeas 36, nays 12
2015-03-27SenateMotion to concur filed
2015-03-18HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2015-03-17HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 296: yeas 52, nays 40
2015-03-16HouseAmendment #3 (VanNatter) failed; Roll Call 284: yeas 37, nays 51
2015-03-16HouseAmendment #2 (VanNatter) failed; voice vote
2015-03-16HouseAmendment #9 (Slager) failed; Roll Call 283: yeas 41, nays 50
2015-03-16HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-03-12HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2015-03-09HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
2015-03-09HouseRepresentative Clere added as cosponsor
2015-03-09HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-03-03HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2015-02-16SenateReferred to the House
2015-02-04SenateRepresentative Brown, C. added as cosponsor
2015-02-04SenateRepresentative Brown, T. added as sponsor
2015-02-03SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 86: yeas 35, nays 14
2015-02-03SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 35 (c) technical corrections.
2015-02-02SenateAmendment #3 (Miller Patricia) prevailed; voice vote
2015-02-02SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2015-01-29SenateSenator Stoops added as coauthor
2015-01-29SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-01-22SenateSenator Mishler added as second author
2015-01-14SenateFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Health & Provider Services
2015-01-14SenateAuthored by Senator Miller Patricia

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2015/bills/senate/460/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/8/6/1/3861ec03/SB0460.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/6/1/d/d61d7d19/SB0460.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/b/c/d/cbcd6a7e/SB0460.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/3/0/2/530269ca/SB0460.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/e/2/b/4e2b9f1a/SB0460.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/d/4/6/bd468cd6/SB0460.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/2/f/7/02f7d376/SB0460.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/7/f/c/57fc8248/SB0460.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/f/7/7/af7782f4/SB0460.05.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/b/f/5/1bf5a0ee/SB0460.05.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/8/1/2/c81293a0/SB0460.06.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/d/f/2/8df27186/SB0460.06.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/0/a/8/10a8aab7/SB0460.07.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/c/4/1/ac41d815/SB0460.86.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/8/a/8/e8a8fedb/SB0460.04.ENGS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/d/a/5/7da5dabf/SB0460.05.COMH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/7/5/e/375ed254/SB0460.283.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/5/6/d/f56dce3c/SB0460.284.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/e/c/f/cecf365f/SB0460.296.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/b/1/6/1b1660aa/SB0460.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/1/3/4/5134cabf/SB0460.364.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback