IN SB0458 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - SECTIONS 6 through 9 effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Requires electronic filing and payment for motor carrier fuel use tax returns. Provides that a passenger vehicle that has seats for more than nine passengers does not have to be registered for the motor carrier fuel use tax. Specifies that the responsibility for civil penalties for an oversize/overweight violation is with the person whose United States Department of Transportation number is registered on the vehicle transporting the load. Authorizes the department of state revenue (department) to impose a penalty that is less than the maximum penalty for an oversize/overweight violation. Provides that, for purposes of persons making occasional trips during eligible events, the department may issue temporary authority or emergency temporary authority for not more than 15 consecutive days. Changes commercial driver license provisions to conform with federal regulations concerning medical issues.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor carriers and commercial drivers licenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-08 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-18 SECTIONS 6 through 9 effective 07/01/2011
2011-05-18 SECTION 5 effective 01/01/2012
2011-05-18 SECTION 4 effective 07/01/2011
2011-05-18 SECTIONS 2 through 3 effective 01/01/2012
2011-05-18 SECTION 1 effective 07/01/2011
2011-05-17 Public Law 45
2011-04-20 Signed by the Governor
2011-04-15 Signed by the President of the Senate
2011-04-13 Signed by the Speaker
2011-04-12 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2011-04-08 Returned to the Senate without amendments
2011-04-08 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 447: yeas 90, nays 0
2011-04-07 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2011-04-04 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2011-03-28 First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
2011-02-15 Cosponsor: Rep. Pflum
2011-02-15 House sponsor: Rep. Davis
2011-02-15 Referred to the House
2011-02-15 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 129: yeas 50 and nays 0
2011-02-14 Amendment 2 (Wyss), prevailed;
2011-02-14 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2011-02-10 Senator Arnold added as second author
2011-02-08 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2011-01-12 First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security, Transportation and Veterans Affairs
2011-01-12 Authored by Senator Wyss

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback