IN SB0443 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
Pending: House Roads and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
Pending: House Roads and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Traffic control. Establishes that the following are Class A infractions: (1) Failure to stop at a traffic control signal resulting in bodily injury. (2) Failure to stop at an entrance to a through highway resulting in bodily injury. (3) Failure to stop at an intersection resulting in bodily injury. Makes an individual less than 18 years of age eligible for a deferral program (under current law, individuals under the age of 18 are not eligible for deferral). Makes conforming changes.
Title
Traffic control.
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Zay [R] | Sen. Mike Bohacek [R] | Sen. Ryan Mishler [R] | Rep. Dave Heine [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-01-28 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Heine |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 93: yeas 41, nays 9 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Bohacek) prevailed; voice vote |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Senator Mishler added as third author |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senator Bohacek added as second author |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senator Zay added as author |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senator Garten removed as author |
2020-01-15 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Authored by Senator Garten |