IN SB0434 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Public Law 11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Public Law 11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Financial aid and tuition. Provides that a person who: (1) is a nonresident; (2) is a member of the Indiana National Guard; and (3) attends a state educational institution; is eligible to pay the resident tuition rate for undergraduate and graduate courses. Provides that certain: (1) veterans; and (2) persons who serve on active military duty; are eligible to pay the resident tuition rate for graduate courses. Provides that the commission for higher education: (1) may consider only the residency status of a student; and (2) may not consider the residency status of the student's parents or legal guardian even
Title
Financial aid and tuition. Provides that a person who: (1) is a nonresident; (2) is a member of the Indiana National Guard; and (3) attends a state educational institution; is eligible to pay the resident tuition rate for undergraduate and graduate courses. Provides that certain: (1) veterans; and (2) persons who serve on active military duty; are eligible to pay the resident tuition rate for graduate courses. Provides that the commission for higher education: (1) may consider only the residency status of a student; and (2) may not consider the residency status of the student's parents or legal guardian even
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-16 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House Committee on Education - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Veterans Affairs & The Military - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House Committee on Education - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Veterans Affairs & The Military - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Senate | Public Law 11 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-03-24 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-03-17 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2015-03-16 | House | Representatives Judy and Zent added as cosponsors |
2015-03-16 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 281: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2015-03-12 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-03-10 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-03-09 | House | Representative Macer added as cosponsor |
2015-03-03 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senator Miller, Pat added as third author |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Representative Baird added as sponsor |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 174: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as second author |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Senator Arnold added as coauthor |
2015-01-12 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs & The Military |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Authored by Senator Hershman |