IN SB0433 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Public Law 90
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Public Law 90
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Structures in floodways. Prohibits the director of the department of natural resources (department) from exercising the authority to remove an abode or residence from a floodway if: (1) the abode or residence was constructed before January 1, 2020; (2) the owner of the abode or residence has taken measures to elevate the lowest floor of the abode or residence to at least two feet above the one hundred year flood elevation within two years after receiving notification from the department concerning the abode or residence; and (3) the owner of the abode or residence has taken necessary measures to comply with all applicable local, state, and federal floodway regulations.
Title
Structures in floodways.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | Public Law 90 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2020-03-10 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 365: yeas 93, nays 1 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 360: yeas 40, nays 8 |
2020-03-10 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2020-03-10 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | House advisors appointed: Torr, Miller D, Lehman, Errington and Fleming |
2020-03-05 | House | House conferees appointed: Lindauer and Pfaff |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Rogers, Taylor G and Doriot |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Bassler and Tallian |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Motion to dissent filed |
2020-03-04 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2020-03-03 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 298: yeas 91, nays 0 |
2020-03-02 | House | Amendment #1 (Miller D) prevailed; voice vote |
2020-03-02 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2020-02-27 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-02-11 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-02-04 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Lindauer |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 192: yeas 48, nays 1 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Bassler) prevailed; voice vote |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senator Doriot added as second author |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-01-15 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bassler |