IN SB0433 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-3)
Status: Passed on April 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-29 - Public Law 84
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Shotguns. Repeals the prohibition against manufacturing, importing, selling, or possessing a sawed-off shotgun. Provides for a 10 year sentence enhancement if a person possesses a sawed-off shotgun in violation of federal law while committing certain offenses. Makes conforming amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Shotguns. Repeals the prohibition against manufacturing, importing, selling, or possessing a sawed-off shotgun. Provides for a 10 year sentence enhancement if a person possesses a sawed-off shotgun in violation of federal law while committing certain offenses. Makes conforming amendments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-24 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 85 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - House Committee on Public Policy - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-29SenatePublic Law 84
2015-04-29SenateSigned by the Governor
2015-04-27SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-04-09HouseSigned by the Speaker
2015-04-08SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2015-03-25HouseReturned to the Senate without amendments
2015-03-24HouseRepresentatives Smaltz, Arnold, Morrison, Eberhart added as cosponsors
2015-03-24HouseRule 105.1 suspended
2015-03-24HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 324: yeas 85, nays 14
2015-03-23HouseRepresentative Nisly added as cosponsor
2015-03-23HouseRule 105.1 suspended
2015-03-23HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-03-19HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2015-03-03HouseRepresentatives VanNatter, Stemler, Goodin added as cosponsors
2015-03-03HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
2015-02-06SenateReferred to the House
2015-02-04SenateRepresentative Lucas added as sponsor
2015-02-03SenateSenator Kruse added as coauthor
2015-02-03SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 85: yeas 44, nays 6
2015-02-02SenateSenator Ford added as coauthor
2015-02-02SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-01-29SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2015-01-26SenateSenator Bassler added as coauthor
2015-01-15SenateSenator Schneider added as coauthor
2015-01-12SenateSenators Delph and Raatz added as coauthors
2015-01-12SenateFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2015-01-12SenateCoauthored by Senators Yoder, Becker, Buck, Walker, Arnold J, Messmer, Smith J, Leising, Bray, Grooms, Holdman
2015-01-12SenateAuthored by Senator Tomes

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2015/bills/senate/433/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/6/9/9/d6991e78/SB0433.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/a/c/d/aacdbd7d/SB0433.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/2/f/7/62f74946/SB0433.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/7/0/4/d704af43/SB0433.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/0/7/8/f07878c8/SB0433.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/8/2/c/382cc137/SB0433.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/f/0/7/2f07fdc2/SB0433.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/5/6/4/a564ad50/SB0433.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/5/4/8/2548b530/SB0433.85.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/d/e/e/1dee83c6/SB0433.02.COMS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/3/4/8/6348631b/SB0433.324.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback