IN SB0429 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Allows type II gaming retailers to profit from qualified drawings. Includes sales of the tickets in the retailer's gross receipts. Limits the size of a qualified drawing conducted for profit by limiting the amount wagered to $500. Prohibits awarding cash, alcohol, and tobacco as prizes in qualified drawings conducted for profit. Requires retailers to report the amounts retained. Requires retailers to obtain tickets for qualified drawings from licensed distributors. Includes tickets for qualified drawings in the preference for Indiana manufacturers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Type II gaming.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-05 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 82 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-18 Effective 07/01/2011
2011-05-17 Public Law 19
2011-04-15 Signed by the Governor
2011-04-12 Signed by the President of the Senate
2011-04-08 Signed by the Speaker
2011-04-07 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2011-04-05 Returned to the Senate without amendments
2011-04-05 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 407: yeas 82, nays 16
2011-04-04 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2011-03-31 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2011-03-28 First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
2011-02-03 Cosponsor: Rep. Tyler
2011-02-03 House sponsor: Rep. Davis
2011-02-03 Referred to the House
2011-02-03 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 68: yeas 27 and nays 21
2011-01-31 Senator Taylor added as coauthor
2011-01-31 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2011-01-27 Senator Arnold added as coauthor
2011-01-27 Senator Lanane added as coauthor
2011-01-27 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2011-01-12 First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
2011-01-12 Authored by Senator Head

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback