IN SB0421 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Representatives Deal, DeVon, Jordan added as cosponsors
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

School corporation disannexation. Creates a process by which Greene Township in St. Joseph County can elect to disannex from an existing school corporation and annex to another existing school corporation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School corporation disannexation. Creates a process by which Greene Township in St. Joseph County can elect to disannex from an existing school corporation and annex to another existing school corporation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - House - House Floor - (Y: 43 N: 53 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-03-14 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19HouseRepresentatives Deal, DeVon, Jordan added as cosponsors
2019-03-19HouseThird reading: defeated; Roll Call 327: yeas 43, nays 53
2019-03-18HouseAmendment #3 (DeLaney) failed; voice vote
2019-03-18HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-03-14HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-03-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment
2019-02-27SenateReferred to the House
2019-02-26SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Wesco
2019-02-26SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 235: yeas 44, nays 4
2019-02-25SenateAmendment #4 (Bohacek) prevailed; voice vote
2019-02-25SenateReread second time: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-02-21SenatePlaced back on second reading
2019-02-18SenateAmendment #3 (Bohacek) prevailed; voice vote
2019-02-18SenateAmendment #1 (Stoops) failed; voice vote
2019-02-18SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-02-07SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-15SenateSenator Mishler added as second author
2019-01-14SenateSenator Niezgodski added as third author
2019-01-14SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
2019-01-14SenateAuthored by Senator Bohacek

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/senate/421/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/e/9/4/7e94fb6b/SB0421.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/3/d/5/b3d5893a/SB0421.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/a/e/c/eaec2211/SB0421.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/e/5/5/ce55b968/SB0421.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/f/9/9/4f991d38/SB0421.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/8/7/0/88704aa2/SB0421.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/3/c/3/53c320d5/SB0421.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/0/3/7/3037e938/SB0421.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/1/e/3/b1e3db0b/SB0421.05.COMH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/a/1/0/9a10681e/SB0421.01.INTR.04.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/8/e/1/98e1fcbf/SB0421.235.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/1/5/9/f159574e/SB0421.04.ENGS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/5/c/3/15c343d4/SB0421.327.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback