IN SB0421 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Public Law 72
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Public Law 72
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Above ground storage tanks. Repeals the law requiring owners of certain above ground storage tanks to register their tanks with the department of environmental management. Authorizes the person responsible for the operation of a public water system to gather information from potential sources of contamination for the purpose of developing or updating the public water system's threat minimization and response plan. Provides that, depending on the circumstances, the information gathered from potential sources of contamination may be excepted from inspection and copying under the public records law. Urges the legislative council to assign to the interim study committee on environmental
Title
Above ground storage tanks. Repeals the law requiring owners of certain above ground storage tanks to register their tanks with the department of environmental management. Authorizes the person responsible for the operation of a public water system to gather information from potential sources of contamination for the purpose of developing or updating the public water system's threat minimization and response plan. Provides that, depending on the circumstances, the information gathered from potential sources of contamination may be excepted from inspection and copying under the public records law. Urges the legislative council to assign to the interim study committee on environmental
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Bassler [R] | Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] | Sen. Karen Tallian [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Rep. David Wolkins [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | Senate | Public Law 72 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-03-29 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2017-03-28 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 326: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2017-03-27 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-03-23 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-02-28 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2017-02-14 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Wolkins |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 122: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Tallian) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Senator Tallian added as coauthor |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as second author |
2017-01-10 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bassler |