IN SB0421 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 192
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

School bus safety.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School bus safety.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-22 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 41 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 79 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 39 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-13HousePublic Law 192
2013-05-07SenateSigned by the Governor
2013-04-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2013-04-25HouseSigned by the Speaker
2013-04-24SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2013-04-22SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 500: yeas 41, nays 7
2013-04-18SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2013-04-17SenateMotion to concur in House amendments filed
2013-04-15HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2013-04-15HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 483: yeas 79, nays 13
2013-04-10HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-04-08HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-03-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2013-02-25SenateCosponsor: Rep. Pryor
2013-02-25SenateHouse sponsor: Rep. Soliday
2013-02-25SenateReferred to the House
2013-02-25SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 190: yeas 39 and nays 11
2013-02-21SenateSenators Banks, Grooms and Paul added as coauthors
2013-02-21SenateSenator Becker added as second author
2013-02-21SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-02-19SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2013-01-10SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security, Transportation and Veterans Affairs
2013-01-10SenateAuthored by Senator Rogers

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback