IN SB0405 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-07-05 - Bill Withdrawn
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes standards for determining residency of candidates for United States Senator and United States Representative for Indiana. Requires a candidate for election to the United States Senate or the United States House of Representatives to have been a resident of Indiana during the calendar year of the election and for each of the five calendar years immediately before the calendar year of the election.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Residency requirements for members of Congress.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-07-05 Bill Withdrawn
2012-06-30 Bill Withdrawn
2012-06-24 Bill Withdrawn
2012-06-19 Bill Withdrawn
2012-06-15 Bill Withdrawn
2012-06-09 Bill Withdrawn
2012-06-03 Bill Withdrawn
2012-05-28 Bill Withdrawn
2012-05-24 Bill Withdrawn
2012-05-19 Bill Withdrawn
2012-05-15 Bill Withdrawn
2012-05-10 Bill Withdrawn
2012-05-04 Bill Withdrawn
2012-04-30 Bill Withdrawn
2012-04-26 Bill Withdrawn
2012-04-21 Bill Withdrawn
2012-04-17 Bill Withdrawn
2012-04-13 Bill Withdrawn
2012-04-09 Bill Withdrawn
2012-04-05 Bill Withdrawn
2012-04-01 Bill Withdrawn
2012-03-27 Bill Withdrawn
2012-03-23 Bill Withdrawn
2012-03-19 Bill Withdrawn
2012-03-14 Bill Withdrawn
2012-03-09 Bill Withdrawn
2012-03-04 Bill Withdrawn
2012-02-28 Bill Withdrawn
2012-02-23 Bill Withdrawn
2012-02-18 Bill Withdrawn
2012-02-11 Bill Withdrawn
2012-02-04 Bill Withdrawn
2012-01-28 Bill Withdrawn
2012-01-09 First reading: referred to Committee on Elections
2012-01-09 Authored by Senator Delph

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback