IN SB0401 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Permits an owner of a mobile home or a manufactured home that is used as a principal place of residence and that is assessed as personal property within a political subdivision to participate in the petition and remonstrance process for the issuance of debt or execution of a lease on a controlled project by the political subdivision.
Title
Petitioners and remonstrators for local debt.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Effective 07/01/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Public Law 41 | |
2010-03-12 | Signed by the Governor | |
2010-03-11 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-03-08 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2010-03-04 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2010-03-01 | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 249: Yeas 45, Nays 0 | |
2010-03-01 | Motion to concur in House amendments filed | |
2010-02-16 | Returned to the Senate with amendments | |
2010-02-16 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 177: Yeas 92, Nays 0 | |
2010-02-15 | Amendment 1 (Thompson), prevailed; Voice Vote | |
2010-02-15 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2010-02-11 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2010-02-02 | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means | |
2010-01-26 | House sponsor: Rep. Goodin | |
2010-01-26 | Referred to the House | |
2010-01-26 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 44: Yeas 50, Nays 0 | |
2010-01-26 | Senator Randolph added as second author | |
2010-01-26 | Senator Randolph removed as coauthor | |
2010-01-21 | Amendment 1 (Yoder), prevailed; | |
2010-01-21 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2010-01-19 | Senator Randolph added as coauthor | |
2010-01-19 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-14 | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy | |
2010-01-14 | Authored by Senator Yoder |