IN SB0388 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-05 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-05 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Reporting of property forfeiture. Requires the Indiana prosecuting attorneys council to make an annual report to the legislative council concerning civil forfeitures conducted in Indiana, and requires the state police department to annually report to the legislative council the amount of money it has received from the federal government as the result of a forfeiture conducted by the federal government.
Title
Reporting of property forfeiture. Requires the Indiana prosecuting attorneys council to make an annual report to the legislative council concerning civil forfeitures conducted in Indiana, and requires the state police department to annually report to the legislative council the amount of money it has received from the federal government as the result of a forfeiture conducted by the federal government.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-05 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Representative Karickhoff added as sponsor |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 244: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Hershman) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Reread second time: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Placed back on second reading |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senator Bray added as second author |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-12 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Authored by Senator Hershman |