IN SB0387 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Public Law 67
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Public Law 67
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Department of correction wardens. Changes Indiana Code references to the "superintendent" of a state penal facility or correctional institution to "warden".
Title
Department of correction wardens. Changes Indiana Code references to the "superintendent" of a state penal facility or correctional institution to "warden".
Sponsors
Sen. James Tomes [R] | Sen. Mark Messmer [R] | Sen. Greg Taylor [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Rep. Thomas Washburne [R] | Rep. Lloyd Arnold [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | Senate | Public Law 67 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-03-23 | House | Representative Arnold added as cosponsor |
2017-03-22 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2017-03-21 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 292: yeas 94, nays 2 |
2017-03-20 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-03-16 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-02-28 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senator Messmer added as second author |
2017-02-14 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Washburne |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 120: yeas 36, nays 14 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Senator Taylor G added as coauthor |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-01-10 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Authored by Senator Tomes |