IN SB0383 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Representative Jackson added as cosponsor
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Air or gas operated weapons on school property. Provides that a person who knowingly or intentionally points an air or gas operated weapon designed to expel a projectile at another person while present on a: (1) school bus; or (2) property affiliated with, belonging to, or operated by: (A) an accredited nonpublic school; (B) a charter school; or (C) a school corporation; commits a Class B misdemeanor. Defines certain terms. Makes conforming amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Air or gas operated weapons on school property. Provides that a person who knowingly or intentionally points an air or gas operated weapon designed to expel a projectile at another person while present on a: (1) school bus; or (2) property affiliated with, belonging to, or operated by: (A) an accredited nonpublic school; (B) a charter school; or (C) a school corporation; commits a Class B misdemeanor. Defines certain terms. Makes conforming amendments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19HouseRepresentative Jackson added as cosponsor
2019-03-19HouseRepresentative Mahan added as cosponsor
2019-03-14HouseReferred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures pursuant to House Rule 84
2019-03-11HouseRepresentative Goodin added as cosponsor
2019-03-07HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-02-26HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2019-02-12SenateReferred to the House
2019-02-11SenateSenator Young M added as second author
2019-02-11SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Steuerwald
2019-02-11SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 97: yeas 48, nays 1
2019-02-07SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2019-02-07SenateSenator Freeman added as third author
2019-02-07SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-05SenateSenator Bohacek added as coauthor
2019-02-05SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-01-14SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
2019-01-14SenateAuthored by Senator Koch

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/senate/383/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/d/3/e/3d3e5867/SB0383.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/e/b/0/0eb0f45c/SB0383.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/8/c/a/48cae975/SB0383.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/8/a/a/f8aa3aa5/SB0383.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/0/8/4/b0844369/SB0383.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/6/a/7/a6a77f11/SB0383.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/9/f/4/c9f40f3e/SB0383.04.COMH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/2/1/f/721fb557/SB0383.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/4/e/f/44efbc5a/SB0383.97.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/7/f/b/17fb1da5/SB0383.02.COMS.00.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback