IN SB0382 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Public Law 65
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Public Law 65
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Indications on driver's licenses. Provides that an individual may request an indication of the individual's status as a surviving spouse of a veteran on the individual's driver's license or state identification card. (Current law provides only for an indication of veteran status.). Requires the bureau of motor vehicles (bureau) to share with the Indiana department of veterans' affairs information submitted to the bureau concerning requests for an indication of status as a surviving spouse of a veteran on a driver's license, permit, or identification card.
Title
Indications on driver's licenses. Provides that an individual may request an indication of the individual's status as a surviving spouse of a veteran on the individual's driver's license or state identification card. (Current law provides only for an indication of veteran status.). Requires the bureau of motor vehicles (bureau) to share with the Indiana department of veterans' affairs information submitted to the bureau concerning requests for an indication of status as a surviving spouse of a veteran on a driver's license, permit, or identification card.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | Senate | Public Law 65 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 352: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2017-03-22 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2017-03-21 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 291: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2017-03-20 | House | Representative Candelaria Reardon added as cosponsor |
2017-03-20 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-03-16 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-03-13 | House | Representative Speedy added as cosponsor |
2017-02-28 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senator Houchin added as coauthor |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senator Sandlin added as coauthor |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senator Buck added as third author |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senator Ruckelshaus added as second author |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Cherry |
2017-02-13 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Frye R |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 94: yeas 47, nays 2 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Senator Niezgodski added as coauthor |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-01-10 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and The Military |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Authored by Senator Crider |